LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB459
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB459
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB459
Compare Versions
SB459 Chaptered September 30, 2013
SB459 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB459 Amended September 11, 2013
SB459 Amended September 6, 2013
SB459 Amended September 3, 2013
SB459 Amended August 5, 2013
SB459 Amended June 24, 2013
SB459 Amended April 25, 2013
SB459 Amended April 8, 2013
SB459 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB459 Chaptered September 30, 2013
SB459 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB459 Amended September 11, 2013
SB459 Amended September 6, 2013
SB459 Amended September 3, 2013
SB459 Amended August 5, 2013
SB459 Amended June 24, 2013
SB459 Amended April 25, 2013
SB459 Amended April 8, 2013
SB459 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare