|
09/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2133.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2831.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2793.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 944.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 936.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 662.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|