California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB46 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013