Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|