LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB47
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB47
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB47
Compare Versions
SB47 Amended August 6, 2013
SB47 Amended August 5, 2013
SB47 Amended May 24, 2013
SB47 Amended March 20, 2013
SB47 Amended January 24, 2013
SB47 Introduced December 18, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB47 Amended August 6, 2013
SB47 Amended August 5, 2013
SB47 Amended May 24, 2013
SB47 Amended March 20, 2013
SB47 Amended January 24, 2013
SB47 Introduced December 18, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare