|
09/28/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4469.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5968.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5911.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|