California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB473 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 7, 2014
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 27, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013