|
10/08/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 660, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2833.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|