California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB484 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2013

Amended

Bill May 6, 2013
Bill April 22, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013