Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1163.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 694.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|