California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB49 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 1, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013