Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on INS. and TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 773.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 663.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|