LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB501
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB501
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB501
Compare Versions
SB501 Amended June 18, 2014
SB501 Amended June 5, 2013
SB501 Amended April 30, 2013
SB501 Amended April 15, 2013
SB501 Amended April 9, 2013
SB501 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB501 Amended June 18, 2014
SB501 Amended June 5, 2013
SB501 Amended April 30, 2013
SB501 Amended April 15, 2013
SB501 Amended April 9, 2013
SB501 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare