Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6234.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1174.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1015.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 484.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|