California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB505 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 15, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013