Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2582.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 642.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|