California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 19, 2014
Bill January 22, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013