California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill May 16, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013