LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB52
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB52
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB52
Compare Versions
SB52 Amended August 18, 2014
SB52 Amended August 4, 2014
SB52 Amended July 1, 2014
SB52 Amended June 18, 2014
SB52 Amended May 16, 2013
SB52 Amended May 7, 2013
SB52 Amended April 24, 2013
SB52 Amended April 1, 2013
SB52 Introduced December 20, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB52 Amended August 18, 2014
SB52 Amended August 4, 2014
SB52 Amended July 1, 2014
SB52 Amended June 18, 2014
SB52 Amended May 16, 2013
SB52 Amended May 7, 2013
SB52 Amended April 24, 2013
SB52 Amended April 1, 2013
SB52 Introduced December 20, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare