California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013