LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB528
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB528
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB528
Compare Versions
SB528 Chaptered September 23, 2013
SB528 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB528 Amended September 3, 2013
SB528 Amended August 5, 2013
SB528 Amended June 26, 2013
SB528 Amended June 20, 2013
SB528 Amended May 28, 2013
SB528 Amended May 8, 2013
SB528 Amended April 15, 2013
SB528 Amended April 1, 2013
SB528 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB528 Chaptered September 23, 2013
SB528 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB528 Amended September 3, 2013
SB528 Amended August 5, 2013
SB528 Amended June 26, 2013
SB528 Amended June 20, 2013
SB528 Amended May 28, 2013
SB528 Amended May 8, 2013
SB528 Amended April 15, 2013
SB528 Amended April 1, 2013
SB528 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare