|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2863.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2793.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1175.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1016.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|