California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill August 30, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013