Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3274.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3032.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 2875.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 661.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|