California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill July 3, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013