|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 519, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2132.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2122.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2013
|
Set for hearing September 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2034.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2707.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2512.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 883.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|