California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB558 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2013

Amended

Bill August 12, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill June 6, 2013
Bill May 1, 2013