Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1449.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing June 19. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Set for hearing June 12. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |