LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB56
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB56
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB56
Compare Versions
SB56 Amended June 11, 2013
SB56 Amended May 30, 2013
SB56 Amended April 23, 2013
SB56 Amended March 4, 2013
SB56 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB56 Amended June 11, 2013
SB56 Amended May 30, 2013
SB56 Amended April 23, 2013
SB56 Amended March 4, 2013
SB56 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare