|
10/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 799, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3193.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1176.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1016.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 468.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|