LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB569
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB569
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB569
Compare Versions
SB569 Chaptered October 13, 2013
SB569 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB569 Amended September 3, 2013
SB569 Amended May 28, 2013
SB569 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB569 Chaptered October 13, 2013
SB569 Enrolled September 19, 2013
SB569 Amended September 3, 2013
SB569 Amended May 28, 2013
SB569 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare