Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5691.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 5108.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2955.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1017.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 640.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|