LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB570
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB570
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB570
Compare Versions
SB570 Amended August 4, 2014
SB570 Amended July 2, 2014
SB570 Amended June 25, 2014
SB570 Amended June 17, 2014
SB570 Amended May 23, 2014
SB570 Amended September 6, 2013
SB570 Amended September 3, 2013
SB570 Amended August 15, 2013
SB570 Amended August 6, 2013
SB570 Amended June 27, 2013
SB570 Amended May 24, 2013
SB570 Amended April 16, 2013
SB570 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB570 Amended August 4, 2014
SB570 Amended July 2, 2014
SB570 Amended June 25, 2014
SB570 Amended June 17, 2014
SB570 Amended May 23, 2014
SB570 Amended September 6, 2013
SB570 Amended September 3, 2013
SB570 Amended August 15, 2013
SB570 Amended August 6, 2013
SB570 Amended June 27, 2013
SB570 Amended May 24, 2013
SB570 Amended April 16, 2013
SB570 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare