|
09/30/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 430, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2135.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2842.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 1093.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 990.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 752.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|