California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 14, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013