|
08/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1680.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2130.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 592.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|