LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB581
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB581
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB581
Compare Versions
SB581 Chaptered August 12, 2013
SB581 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB581 Amended June 18, 2013
SB581 Amended April 8, 2013
SB581 Amended April 1, 2013
SB581 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB581 Chaptered August 12, 2013
SB581 Enrolled August 2, 2013
SB581 Amended June 18, 2013
SB581 Amended April 8, 2013
SB581 Amended April 1, 2013
SB581 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare