|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 288, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 2713.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 697.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|