California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill May 13, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013