California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB593 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill January 27, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014
Bill April 23, 2013