LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB593
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB593
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB593
Compare Versions
SB593 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB593 Amended August 22, 2014
SB593 Amended August 18, 2014
SB593 Amended July 2, 2014
SB593 Amended June 10, 2014
SB593 Amended January 27, 2014
SB593 Amended January 6, 2014
SB593 Amended April 23, 2013
SB593 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB593 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB593 Amended August 22, 2014
SB593 Amended August 18, 2014
SB593 Amended July 2, 2014
SB593 Amended June 10, 2014
SB593 Amended January 27, 2014
SB593 Amended January 6, 2014
SB593 Amended April 23, 2013
SB593 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare