|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 2132.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 4. Page 2722.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 1044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 464.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|