California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Amended

Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 20, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013