|
08/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2483.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1170.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 390.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|