California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB60 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2013

Amended

Bill May 28, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013