Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1162.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 569.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|