California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Amended

Bill August 7, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 15, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013