|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 521, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2136.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2845.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 486.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|