California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB609 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2013

Amended

Bill August 7, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013