|
09/29/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4732.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 6050.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1087.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|